U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 24, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 02, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 20, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 26, 2016: [Request]
  • May 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2016: [Request]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.