U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lunderman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 07, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 08, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 29, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 07, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 06, 2018: [Furlough]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 20, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 15, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 06, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • September 28, 2016: [Variance]
  • September 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Furlough]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 23, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 19, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 19, 2016: [Request]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.