U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 17, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • August 02, 2018: [Request for Early Termination]
  • August 02, 2018: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 23, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 24, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 05, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Variance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Variance]
  • August 31, 2016: [Departure]
  • August 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 16, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 18, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 11, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 20, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2016: [Request]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 24, 2016: [Request]
  • May 24, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 20, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.