U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Antelope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2016: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 23, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 20, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Request]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.