U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 06, 2016: [Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 20, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2016: [Request]
  • May 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.