U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Tail
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 23, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 12, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Release from Custody]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 07, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 10, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 11, 2017: [Extend]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2016: [Request]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Request]
  • August 24, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 24, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.