U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cross Dog
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 21, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 02, 2016: [Disclosure ]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • July 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2016: [Request]
  • May 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.