U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Wolf et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • February 07, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • February 07, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 06, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 20, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • March 01, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 01, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • February 26, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 26, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 06, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 06, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 04, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 12, 2017: [Furlough]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 19, 2017: [Vacate (Not 28:2255)]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 17, 2017: [Jury List]
  • July 17, 2017: [Jury Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 14, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Response]
  • July 11, 2017: [Trial Brief ]
  • July 11, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Text Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 30, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 30, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 30, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Furlough]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [In Limine]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 23, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 10, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 12, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 24, 2016: [Furlough]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Response]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 15, 2016: [Extend]
  • July 13, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Response]
  • July 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Exclude]
  • July 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 08, 2016: [For Order]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Request]
  • June 08, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Request]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.