U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05031
  • Case Name: Feist v. Weber
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 03, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • May 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 19, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.