U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-50066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouillard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Response]
  • January 04, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • December 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 20, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.