U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 01, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 28, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2017: [Furlough]
  • June 22, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2016: [Consent]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 26, 2016: [Request]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 24, 2016: [Request]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.