U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yankton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.