U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:99-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 08, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2022: [Consent]
  • July 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2022: [Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 07, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 07, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • March 07, 2022: [Request]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2022: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Indictment]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.