U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04067
  • Case Name: Perez v. Augustus Management, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Costs]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Status Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Text Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Costs]
  • July 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned]
  • July 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 11, 2016: [Ex Parte Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 06, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 24, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 24, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 24, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.