U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 29, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 31, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2016: [Arrest]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.