U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mills
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2017: [Status Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
  • September 12, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Request]
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 31, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.