U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown Bull et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Request]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Arrest]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.