U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaPointe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 07, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Furlough]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Furlough]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • June 17, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • May 30, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 21, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 13, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 31, 2016: [Text Order]
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 25, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.