U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swallow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 14, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 22, 2017: [Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 11, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 08, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 15, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 22, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2016: [Request]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2016: [Arrest]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 25, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.