U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hollingsworth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2016: [Waiver]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.