U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Supplement]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 09, 2020: [Response]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 02, 2020: [Extend]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • August 18, 2020: [Admission]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 13, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 11, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Mail Returned]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 17, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • April 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • March 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 13, 2016: [Response]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 06, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 20, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 19, 2016: [Revoke]
  • October 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2016: [Arrest]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 21, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 31, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 31, 2016: [Request]
  • May 31, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 26, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.