U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huebner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 13, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • August 03, 2017: [Transport Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 31, 2016: [Request]
  • May 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 27, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 26, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.