U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 06, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 19, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 31, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 18, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.