U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 20, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 15, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.