U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 18, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • January 21, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 21, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 09, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 04, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 03, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 03, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Evaluation]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 29, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2017
  • August 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Furlough]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.