U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. First In Trouble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 24, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.