U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 11, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Request]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 03, 2016: [Request]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 01, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 01, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.