U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 06, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 02, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 03, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2016: [Extend]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Furlough]
  • June 27, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 06, 2016: [Request]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 03, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 01, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.