U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-50029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Hair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • July 06, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 09, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 08, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 30, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 30, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Furlough]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 12, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 13, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 30, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 23, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.