U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 04, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 04, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 04, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.