U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wahl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 06, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 06, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.