U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blaine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Response]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 07, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Order]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.