U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Towne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 27, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Request]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2016: [Request]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2016: [Arrest]
  • September 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.