U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • July 06, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 29, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 26, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 11, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 17, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 14, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 22, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 01, 2017: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 22, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 22, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 20, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 12, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Suppress]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • September 20, 2016: [Compel ]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 05, 2016: [Discovery]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Response]
  • June 24, 2016: [Request]
  • June 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.