U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Titus et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 18, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 13, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 18, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 18, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
  • February 25, 2020: [Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 27, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2018
  • May 28, 2018: [Forfeiture]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 06, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Request]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 30, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 01, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 19, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 12, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 12, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Suppress]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2016: [Text Order]
  • September 02, 2016: [Furlough]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • July 12, 2016: [Response]
  • July 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2016: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • July 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 01, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 01, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Request]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 07, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.