U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-40060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Balster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 07, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 17, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.