U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Theus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 14, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 14, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • June 14, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 14, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • June 14, 2017: [Verdict]
  • June 14, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • June 14, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 14, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 14, 2017: [Jury List]
  • June 12, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 09, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Brief]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 06, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 06, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 06, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 24, 2017: [In Limine]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 10, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 09, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 09, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2017: [Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 14, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 14, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Supplement]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Suppress]
  • November 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 21, 2016: [Discovery]
  • June 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 08, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.