U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. South Dakota Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • January 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 18, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 18, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 03, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 14, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 07, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • July 25, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 16, 2016: [Show Cause]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Removal from State Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.