U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dillon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2021: [Waiver]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 24, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 27, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • June 10, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Request for Summons]
  • June 10, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.