U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grey Owl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Redact Transcript]
  • February 07, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 07, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 07, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 17, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • August 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 25, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 07, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.