U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 26, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 26, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 08, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 21, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 14, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 14, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 14, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • October 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.