U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:06-cr-50068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bordeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 03, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.