U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Left Hand Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 20, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 09, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 08, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • October 02, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Mail Returned]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • February 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • January 07, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 02, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • March 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 30, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2019: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • January 28, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 28, 2019: [Request for Warrant]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
  • November 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Exhibit List]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Medical Treatment]
  • October 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 25, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 08, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 04, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 04, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Reconsideration]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.