U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Croyle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 29, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 11, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.