U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neyal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 06, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 12, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 12, 2017: [Extend]
  • January 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 29, 2016: [Transcript]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 14, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 04, 2016: [Supplement]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Suppress]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Response]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2016: [Request]
  • June 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.