U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flying Bye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 10, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2017: [Extend]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • June 01, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 31, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 23, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 23, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 22, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Request]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Request]
  • June 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.