U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parisien
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 09, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 02, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 01, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 06, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2017: [Extend]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Request]
  • July 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Request]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.