U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cameron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 05, 2016: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • August 05, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • August 04, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Request]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 30, 2016: [Arrest]
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.