U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Face
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 30, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Furlough]
  • January 30, 2017: [Furlough]
  • January 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Extend]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Request]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Request]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 21, 2016: [Arrest]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.