U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Balster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Response]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 07, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 07, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 20, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 19, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 19, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 18, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 18, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 05, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Psychiatric Report Received]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Psychiatric Report Received]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 01, 2017: [Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2016: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 15, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.